Financial history HOLNE CHASE PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1097846
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £19.04k £19.66k £25.21k £22.37k £27.30k
Total expenditure £18.30k £20.64k £26.45k £21.77k £28.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A