Accounts and annual returns HALL GREEN INFANT AND JUNIOR SCHOOLS HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1097037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 October 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 12 October 2023 11 December 2024 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 12 October 2022 11 December 2024 487 days late
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 12 October 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 12 October 2020 05 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 12 October 2020 Not Required