Accounts and annual returns BRISTOL CATHEDRAL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1098758
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 February 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required