Accounts and annual returns THE FOUR SEASONS ACTIVITY GROUP

Charity number: 1099112
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 28 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 14 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 14 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 14 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 17 January 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 24 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 11 January 2012 On Time