Financial history THE FOUR SEASONS ACTIVITY GROUP

Charity number: 1099112
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £37.92k £41.43k £44.77k £34.24k £20.19k
Total expenditure £31.84k £37.92k £34.56k £37.79k £45.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A