Accounts and annual returns DALTON LE DALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1098764
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2013 04 March 2014 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2012 04 March 2014 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2012 04 March 2014 392 days late