Financial history DALTON LE DALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1098764
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2009 05/04/2010 05/04/2011 05/04/2012 05/04/2013
Total gross income £27.11k £12.14k £10.26k £28.98k £10.43k
Total expenditure £66.74k £11.82k £8.00k £8.08k £32.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A