Accounts and annual returns YOUNG ENTERPRISE EAST OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 1098610
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2010 14 April 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 14 April 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2009 24 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 24 May 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2008 20 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 26 May 2009 On Time