Financial history YOUNG ENTERPRISE EAST OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 1098610
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2006 31/07/2007 31/07/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010
Total gross income £676.05k £982.85k £876.86k £817.02k £691.43k
Total expenditure £802.56k £944.50k £1.04m £888.49k £703.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £672.54k £579.59k £512.89k £438.26k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £285.18k £272.16k £297.78k £253.02k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £25.13k £25.11k £6.36k £150
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £930.60k £1.02m £862.88k £676.91k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £7.56k £5.12k £7.07k £4.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0