Financial history ETHIOPIAN NATIONAL CONSENSUS FORUM

Charity number: 1103925
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £200 £780 £11.78k £190 £0
Total expenditure £0 £262 £8.48k £3.32k £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A