Financial history GLOBAL ORGANISATION FOR LYSOSOMAL DISEASES

Charity number: 1102478
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £53.72k £15.78k £39.14k £55.12k £18.13k
Total expenditure £71.78k £45.59k £72.53k £63.69k £52.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A