Accounts and annual returns NAGORIK MANCHU (CIVIC FORUM)

Charity number: 1100260
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 13 December 2010 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2008 14 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2007 31 October 2008 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 21 May 2008 On Time