Financial history NAGORIK MANCHU (CIVIC FORUM)

Charity number: 1100260
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2005 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009
Total gross income £6.80k £5.05k £6.85k £9.17k £4
Total expenditure £3.31k £5.99k £4.78k £7.04k £7.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A