Financial history HOLY TRINITY SCHOOL PTA (MARLOW)

Charity number: 1099466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £27.39k £21.87k £42.24k £37.58k £33.03k
Total expenditure £24.85k £23.62k £22.66k £30.18k £21.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A