Financial history DEIGHTON GATES PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1100640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.98k £4.62k £8.67k £11.40k £23.09k
Total expenditure £15.34k £6.12k £2.51k £16.72k £18.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £250 N/A N/A £150 £1.05k