Trustees DEIGHTON GATES PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity Number: 1100640
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Pedley Chair 20 April 2023
None on record
Tamsin Day Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Rosemary Evans Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
Paul Froes Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
Katie Horridge Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record