Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ABBEYDALE PICTURE HOUSE

Charity number: 1101215
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2011 30 March 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2011 30 March 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2010 28 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2010 28 February 2011 On Time