Financial history KENT AND MEDWAY YOUNG MUSICIANS TRUST

Charity number: 1101969
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2019 30/08/2020 30/08/2021 30/08/2022 30/08/2023
Total gross income £315 £3.00k £0 £3.61k £6.77k
Total expenditure £1.87k £1.97k £2.00k £5.98k £9.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A