Trustees KENT AND MEDWAY YOUNG MUSICIANS TRUST
Charity number: 1101969

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Nicolaus Evans | Trustee | 27 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Graeme Barham | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Bennett | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GRETTON | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Daniel Millest | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Joanna Mayfield | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeannette Mary Ward | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Litten | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.