Accounts and annual returns THE CENTRE OF THE CELL

Charity number: 1102034
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2013 25 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 25 April 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2012 11 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 11 March 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2011 07 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 07 February 2012 On Time