Accounts and annual returns TABITHA FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1102500
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 07 December 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 04 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 14 February 2020 On Time