Financial history TABITHA FOUNDATION UK

Charity Number: 1102500
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £76.28k £91.07k £55.47k £44.78k £42.20k
Total expenditure £64.17k £102.60k £54.98k £48.38k £38.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A