Accounts and annual returns CENTRE FOR MULTI-CULTURAL DEVELOPMENT & INTEGRATION

Charity number: 1105839
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 May 2020 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required