Financial history CENTRE FOR MULTI-CULTURAL DEVELOPMENT & INTEGRATION

Charity number: 1105839
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £59.87k £43.95k £27.89k £12.01k £20.06k
Total expenditure £59.78k £43.23k £27.89k £11.95k £18.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A