Accounts and annual returns CHURCH OF WORSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1102875
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 November 2020 304 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 November 2020 304 days late