Financial history CHURCH OF WORSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1102875
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £34.68k £38.63k £43.87k £34.40k £32.95k
Total expenditure £36.24k £36.76k £44.80k £31.99k £36.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A