Accounts and annual returns THE RIX CENTRE

Charity number: 1105410
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2014 06 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 October 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 31 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 31 October 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 02 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 02 November 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 28 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 28 October 2011 On Time