Financial history THE RIX CENTRE

Charity number: 1105410
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 30/06/2014
Total gross income £467.32k £228.12k £248.06k £159.07k £55.93k
Total expenditure £386.50k £305.25k £248.13k £184.87k £105.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A