Financial history MILLER'S ARK

Charity number: 1105059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.44k £67.23k £32.63k £24.99k £53.04k
Total expenditure £48.98k £60.62k £53.97k £50.23k £76.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £32.01k £2.93k N/A N/A