Accounts and annual returns LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF HAWTHORN CRESCENT

Charity number: 1104922
Charity reporting is overdue by 1166 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 70 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 70 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 435 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 435 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 801 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 801 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1166 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1166 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 13 March 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required