Governing document FALKLAND SURGERY PATIENTS PARTICIPATION GROUP

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 01/01/2000 AS AMENDED ON 13/10/2003 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 11 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AMONG THE PATIENTS OF FALKLAND SURGERY, BY THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL EQUIPMENT IN AUGMENTATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED BY THE SURGERY OR THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE, BY OFFERING ADVICE AND GUIDANCE TO SUCH PATIENTS WITH REGARD TO THE SERVICES AVAILABLE AT THE SURGERY AND THEIR GENERAL WELLBEING AND FOSTERING THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARD OF PRIMARY CARE THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF PATIENT PARTICIPATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.