Accounts and annual returns THE JEAN GINSBURG MEMORIAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1104077
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2015 26 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2014 25 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2013 26 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2012 19 February 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2012 Not Required