Financial history THE JEAN GINSBURG MEMORIAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1104077
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2011 30/04/2012 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015
Total gross income £12 £15 £10 £103 £0
Total expenditure £7.65k £14.45k £18.73k £7.00k £4.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A