Accounts and annual returns TRUST FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 1105329
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2011 30 March 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2010 17 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 19 April 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2009 26 May 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 26 May 2010 On Time