Financial history TRUST FOR CHILDREN

Charity Number: 1105329
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2007 31/05/2008 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011
Total gross income £174.09k £203.64k £72.11k £0 £0
Total expenditure £178.29k £144.05k £113.13k £52.02k £1.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A