Accounts and annual returns LINGFIELD PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1104366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 July 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2023 10 July 2024 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2022 31 May 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2021 01 July 2022 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 July 2020 01 August 2021 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2020 Not Required