Financial history LINGFIELD PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1104366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/07/2020 30/07/2021 30/07/2022 30/07/2023 30/07/2024
Total gross income £11.56k £8.24k £17.99k £17.01k £19.42k
Total expenditure £2.95k £2.63k £3.63k £18.93k £1.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A