Accounts and annual returns THREE CROSS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1104822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 June 2024 240 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 December 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 March 2022 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 March 2021 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required