Financial history THREE CROSS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1104822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.95k £15.67k £12.76k £15.64k £14.55k
Total expenditure £9.51k £17.92k £12.50k £14.06k £4.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A