Accounts and annual returns WIGAN & LEIGH BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1106872
Charity reporting is overdue by 1468 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Annual return 22 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 372 days
Annual return 22 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 738 days
Annual return 22 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1103 days
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1103 days
Annual return 22 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1468 days
Accounts and TAR 22 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1468 days