Accounts and annual returns HOUSE OF EMPOWERMENT INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY

Charity Number: 1105462
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 March 2025 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 11 March 2025 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 May 2024 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 May 2024 111 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 July 2023 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 July 2023 170 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window