Financial history HOUSE OF EMPOWERMENT INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY

Charity Number: 1105462
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £108.56k £144.51k £116.70k £98.66k £147.63k
Total expenditure £103.05k £138.46k £133.18k £93.96k £106.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £45.90k N/A N/A N/A