Financial history CRONFA ELW PARK-JONES

Charity Number: 1105444
Charity reporting is up to date (289 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £57.22k £48.57k £44.62k £49.46k £57.14k
Total expenditure £48.34k £48.21k £42.47k £32.53k £38.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A