Accounts and annual returns HAVERING JUNIOR PHAB

Charity Number: 1107159
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 17 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required