Financial history HAVERING JUNIOR PHAB

Charity Number: 1107159
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £3.37k £4.21k £4.50k £4.04k £3.36k
Total expenditure £3.23k £3.18k £3.64k £3.22k £3.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A