Accounts and annual returns BRENT NORTH YOUTH SPORTS PILOT PROJECT

Charity number: 1108300
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2010 12 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 12 June 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2009 17 March 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2009 17 March 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2008 07 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 07 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2007 11 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 11 March 2008 On Time