Accounts and annual returns THE HOUSE OF MERCY MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1106597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 14 May 2025 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 14 May 2025 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 02 June 2023 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 11 May 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required