Accounts and annual returns DIVERSITY ARTS INCUBATION PROGRAMME LTD
Charity number: 1110193
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | 07 April 2011 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | 28 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | 18 June 2009 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | 26 March 2009 | 26 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window