Financial history DIVERSITY ARTS INCUBATION PROGRAMME LTD

Charity number: 1110193
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2006 30/04/2007 30/04/2008 30/04/2009 30/04/2010
Total gross income £84.55k £99.61k £33.82k £7.00k £0
Total expenditure £48.45k £74.09k £55.57k £6.65k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A