Accounts and annual returns DRAGON BANDS

Charity number: 1107406
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 06 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 27 May 2014 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 10 March 2014 38 days late
Annual return 31 March 2012 12 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required